Capital Budgets

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0071 / CH0495
    (SB0056)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)AppropriationsBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0597
    (SB0867)
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0056
    (HB0071 / CH0495)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0867
    (HB0597)
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf FieldsSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.