Cecil County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0212 / CH0356
    (SB0049)
Alcoholic Beverages - Cecil and Queen Anne's Counties - Beer and Wine FestivalsSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0705Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Boys & Girls Club of Cecil County Northeast Renovation ProjectDelegate RudolphIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1034Creation of a State Debt - Charlestown - Cecil Inn RenovationsDelegate RudolphIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1171 / CH0672
    (SB1011)
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of OperationCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 672Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1244
    (SB0795)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1425Cecil County - Special Wine Festival LicensesCecil County DelegationIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0132Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue AccountSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0392 / CH0253Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0795
    (HB1244)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1011
    (HB1171 / CH0672)
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of OperationCecil County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.