Cecil County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0284 / CH0607
    (SB0636)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0373 / CH0608Cecil County - Home Detention and Release ProgramsCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0379
    (SB1132)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial VillageCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0411 / CH0068
    (SB1057 / CH0067)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness ProgramCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0849
    (SB1133)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0636
    (HB0284 / CH0607)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0637Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention ProgramsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1057 / CH0067
    (HB0411 / CH0068)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness ProgramCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1132
    (HB0379)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial VillageCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1133
    (HB0849)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.