Chesapeake Bay

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0103Chesapeake Bay Trust - Restrictions on Investments - RepealDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0156
    (SB0133 / CH0153)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0207 / CH0408
    (SB0106)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - ExpansionDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0302
    (SB0028)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0419
    (SB0709)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User ConflictsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0633Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Agriculture (M4)
HB0821 / CH0458Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition - Second DutiesDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0886
    (SB0533)
Bay Tax Equity ActDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0962Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Exclusion for Driveways Constructed of Decking MaterialDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0963Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Calculation for Swimming PoolsDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0982
    (SB0684)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1043Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - ExemptionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
HB1145
    (SB0903)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentDelegate FrushIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1149
    (SB0731)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime MuseumDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1268
    (SB0919)
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - LimitationDelegate JacobsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0028
    (HB0302)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0106
    (HB0207 / CH0408)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - ExpansionSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0133 / CH0153
    (HB0156)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0533
    (HB0886)
Bay Tax Equity ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0600 / CH0370Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - FundingSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0684
    (HB0982)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0709
    (HB0419)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User ConflictsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0731
    (HB1149)
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime MuseumSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0863 / CH0124Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - RevisionsSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0903
    (HB1145)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0919
    (HB1268)
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - LimitationSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SJ0001Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)Senator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.