Chesapeake Bay

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104
    (SB0149 / CH0434)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsDelegate RobinsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0361
    (SB0314)
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0560
    (SB0034)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0576Bay Restoration Fund – On–Site Sewage Disposal System Grants and Loans – Proof of IncomeDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0654
    (SB0264)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0766
    (SB0610)
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic ReviewDelegate HealeyIn the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0947
    (SB0958)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1055State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018)Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1199Northern Bay CrossingDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1381Environmental Violations - Reporting RequirementsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1426Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery AreasDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1455Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - ProhibitionDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1503State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback DuckDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1765 / CH0585On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial AssistanceDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0034
    (HB0560)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0089 / CH0060Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - RepealChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0149 / CH0434
    (HB0104)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0183Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - DonationsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Second Reading PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0264
    (HB0654)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0314
    (HB0361)
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0358Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Unimproved PropertySenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0777Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners AssociationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0958
    (HB0947)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1237Natural Resources - Public Shellfish Fishery Area - StandardsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.