Child Care

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001 / CH0317
    (SB0185 / CH0316)
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial ScholarshipDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0006Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3 YearsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0244 / CH0313
    (SB0526)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Delegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0473 / CH0423
    (SB0562)
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With DisabilitiesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
HB0564 / CH0435State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0641
    (SB0487)
Family Child Care - Registration Requirements for Participants in Maryland Child Care Subsidy ProgramDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0742
    (SB0201 / CH0331)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsDelegate HayesIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0776
    (SB0687)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0856
    (SB0571)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0955Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0987
    (SB0693)
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact AnalysisDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1069
    (SB0677 / CH0377)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanDelegate RosenbergVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1286
    (SB0930)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center ExpansionDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0185 / CH0316
    (HB0001 / CH0317)
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial ScholarshipSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0201 / CH0331
    (HB0742)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0363Great Preschools Tax Credit ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0487
    (HB0641)
Child Care - Providers and Maryland Child Care Subsidy ProgramSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0526
    (HB0244 / CH0313)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0562
    (HB0473 / CH0423)
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With DisabilitiesSenator PetersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0571
    (HB0856)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0677 / CH0377
    (HB1069)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0687
    (HB0776)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0693
    (HB0987)
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact AnalysisSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0930
    (HB1286)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center ExpansionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0940 / CH0214Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for RelocationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.