Child Care

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023
    (SB0341 / CH0696)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0079
    (SB0567)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater WashingtonDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0206Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - ProhibitionDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0335 / CH0563Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0395
    (SB0293 / CH0740)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportDelegate KellyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0418 / CH0209
    (SB0294 / CH0210)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0452Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Center and Employer-Provided Child Care ServicesDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0456 / CH0713
    (SB0943 / CH0714)
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution ProcessDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 713Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsChildren (O4)
HB0508Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1197
    (SB0797)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1263 / CH0651
    (SB0996 / CH0652)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - DefinitionsDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1319Child Care Centers - Operating Without a License - PenaltiesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1330Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1559
    (SB0173)
Commission on Access to Tax-Preferred Health and Childcare Savings Accounts for All MarylandersDelegate KellyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0173
    (HB1559)
Commission on Access to Tax-Preferred Health and Childcare Savings Accounts for All MarylandersSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0293 / CH0740
    (HB0395)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 740Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0294 / CH0210
    (HB0418 / CH0209)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 210Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0341 / CH0696
    (HB0023)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 696Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0368Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0567
    (HB0079)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bender Jewish Community Center of Greater WashingtonSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0797
    (HB1197)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0943 / CH0714
    (HB0456 / CH0713)
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution ProcessSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 714Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0996 / CH0652
    (HB1263 / CH0651)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - DefinitionsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.