Child Care

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten ProgramsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0057Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0068Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Center and Employer-Provided Child Care ServicesDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0084Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - ProhibitionDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0141
    (SB0782)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0228Child Care Centers - Definition of Child CareDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0430 / CH0563
    (SB0379 / CH0564)
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding LevelsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0519
    (SB0422)
Income Tax - Credit for Child and Dependent Care Expenses - Income EligibilityDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0650
    (SB0985)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - The Children's Center of North HarfordDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0775
    (SB0859 / CH0752)
State Employees - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0883Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Center and Employer-Provided Child Care ServicesDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0941 / CH0396Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1032
    (SB0684)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1610State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and RenovationsDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1747 / CH0799Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - ExceptionsDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 799Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0058 / CH0411State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0379 / CH0564
    (HB0430 / CH0563)
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding LevelsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0422
    (HB0519)
Income Tax - Credit for Child and Dependent Care Expenses - Income EligibilitySenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0684
    (HB1032)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0782
    (HB0141)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0859 / CH0752
    (HB0775)
State Employees – Parental LeaveSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0985
    (HB0650)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - The Children's Center of North HarfordSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.