Children, Governor's Office for

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0151 / CH0216Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting RequirementDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0577
    (SB1018)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0904 / CH0621Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and ReportDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB1018
    (HB0577)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesSenator ReillyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.