Churches

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0183Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0321 / CH0334
    (SB0046 / CH0333)
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0334Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0516 / CH0269Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0642 / CH0110
    (SB0033)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0643
    (SB0893)
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of WorshipDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0729Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0746Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1030Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Near Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 1-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1049
    (SB0792)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1064 / CH0292Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance From Places of Worship, Schools, and Youth Centers MC 18-16Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1067Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Exemption From Minimum Distance Restrictions MC 8-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1075Montgomery County - Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Exemption From Distance Restrictions MC 23-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1081
    (SB0817)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Tabernacle Church of Laurel GymnasiumDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1186Sex Offender Registrants - School Polling Place - AlternativeDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1210 / CH0736
    (SB0561)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesDelegate ClippingerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1302
    (SB0347)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community CenterDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1304
    (SB1036)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltyDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1385 / CH0510Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1567
    (SB0489)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Orchard Street ChurchDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1621
    (SB0165)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care CenterDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0033
    (HB0642 / CH0110)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0046 / CH0333
    (HB0321 / CH0334)
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0165
    (HB1621)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care CenterSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0347
    (HB1302)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Get Involved Community CenterSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0489
    (HB1567)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Orchard Street ChurchSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0561
    (HB1210 / CH0736)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0792
    (HB1049)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0817
    (HB1081)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Tabernacle Church of Laurel GymnasiumSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0893
    (HB0643)
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of WorshipSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1036
    (HB1304)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltySenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.