Citations

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0105Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - PenaltiesDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0404
    (SB0279)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0410Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Application to Right TurnsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0489 / CH0425
    (SB0007)
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and EnforcementDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0494Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0615Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0856
    (SB0571)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0865
    (SB0140)
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages InspectorsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1015Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
HB1130Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1241 / CH0122Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related FeesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0007
    (HB0489 / CH0425)
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and EnforcementSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
SB0140
    (HB0865)
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages InspectorsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0229Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil PenaltiesCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0279
    (HB0404)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0410 / CH0168
    (HB0506)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetySenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0517Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug ParaphernaliaSenator ZirkinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0571
    (HB0856)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0755 / CH0380Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee CandidatesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0790Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.