Citations

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Criminal Law - Display of Material Harmful to Minors - RestrictionsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0242Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0254Division of Parole and Probation - Revocation Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0277Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County LawsDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
HB0329 / CH0184
    (SB0312 / CH0183)
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and PenaltiesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsChildren (O4)
HB0347Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0436
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0562Speed Monitoring Systems - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - RepealDelegate CarrIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0611Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - LimitationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0861Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and TaxationDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0918
    (SB0957)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear ViolationsDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0977Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1021 / CH0730Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1035Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Days and Times of Operation, Minimum Excess Speed, and PenaltiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1119Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantityDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1257Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Provisions - RepealDelegate AdamsIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1452
    (SB0902)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1504Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and EnforcementDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0123Interstate Boating Violator CompactSenator SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0149Juvenile Law - Citations for ViolationsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0204Electronic Smoking Devices - E-Liquid Containers - Child-Resistant PackagingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0312 / CH0183
    (HB0329 / CH0184)
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and PenaltiesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0468
    (HB0436)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0891Criminal Law - Use and Possession of MarijuanaSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0902
    (HB1452)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0957
    (HB0918)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties - Gear ViolationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1073Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.