Citations

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0204 / CH0290Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Yellow Signal ComplianceDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0277Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)Delegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Ways and Means
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0323
    (SB0248)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0325
    (SB0446)
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantityDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0492Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0672Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited ActsDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0953
    (SB0456)
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil FinesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1094 / CH0785Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and PenaltiesDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 785Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB1151Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring SystemsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1172 / CH0520
    (SB0558)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1662 / CH0237Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1718Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - LimitationDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1769Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement - Leased VehiclesDelegate KipkeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0248
    (HB0323)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0446
    (HB0325)
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantitySenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0456
    (HB0953)
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil FinesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0558
    (HB1172 / CH0520)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0628Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil OffensesSenator SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.