Claims

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0300 / CH0451Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0601 / CH0673
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0676
    (SB0670)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1162Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on FeesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1206
    (SB0377)
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Counterclaims and Cross-ClaimsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1293
    (SB0425)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1294 / CH0070
    (SB0426 / CH0069)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1332
    (SB0697)
Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation - Covered ClaimsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1347
    (SB0877)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1353Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing FieldsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1373
    (SB0336)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1476 / CH0565
    (SB0867 / CH0566)
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - PenaltyDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1484 / CH0567
    (SB0194 / CH0568)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1487Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1642
    (SB1169 / CH0733)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0026 / CH0632Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal CorporationsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0194 / CH0568
    (HB1484 / CH0567)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0260Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0336
    (HB1373)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0377
    (HB1206)
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Counterclaims and Cross-ClaimsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0425
    (HB1293)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0426 / CH0069
    (HB1294 / CH0070)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0566Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0670
    (HB0676)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0697
    (HB1332)
Insurance - Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation - Covered ClaimsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0742Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Claim for Damages - RepealSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0867 / CH0566
    (HB1476 / CH0565)
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - PenaltySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0873 / CH0489
    (HB1052)
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - AlterationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0877
    (HB1347)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0924 / CH0479Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and RegistrantsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1058Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1169 / CH0733
    (HB1642)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 733Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.