Clerks of Court

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0190District Court Electronic Citation Fund and FeeDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0801 / CH0641Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 641Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0950 / CH0054
    (SB0421 / CH0053)
Circuit Court Clerks - SalaryDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1156
    (SB0819)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0421 / CH0053
    (HB0950 / CH0054)
Circuit Court Clerks - SalarySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0819
    (HB1156)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.