Clerks of Court

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0201District Court Electronic Citation Fund and FeeDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0377State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal ConvictionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0542
    (SB0017)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Family Law (D4)
HB0857Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit CourtsDelegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0999 / CH0106Code Revision - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1171State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal ConvictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1186Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1245
    (SB0922 / CH0205)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1328
    (SB0865 / CH0567)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsDelegate SwainIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB1449Criminal Procedure - Marijuana Diversion ProgramDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0017
    (HB0542)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0319Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0865 / CH0567
    (HB1328)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0922 / CH0205
    (HB1245)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0973
    (HB1232)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and ReleaseSenator FroshIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1003Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational RequirementsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1090Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance FeePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.