Commerce, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0059
    (SB0085 / CH0338)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0278
    (SB0415)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0477
    (SB0211)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0500
    (SB1086)
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in MarylandDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0531
    (SB0181)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0548
    (SB0429)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0622Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Expansion of International Market Presence - Feasibility StudyDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0743Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task ForceDelegate Robinson, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1343
    (SB0706)
Maryland Education CreditDelegate HayesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1533 / CH0604
    (SB1062 / CH0603)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1553
    (SB1066)
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development DistrictDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1589
    (SB0882 / CH0444)
Economic Development - Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthorityDelegate ReillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0085 / CH0338
    (HB0059)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0181
    (HB0531)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0211
    (HB0477)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsSenator KingIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0246Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - ExtensionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0386
    (HB0450)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0415
    (HB0278)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0429
    (HB0548)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0560One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0608 / CH0225Employees' Pension System - Redeposit of ContributionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0622
    (HB0471)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0706
    (HB1343)
Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0882 / CH0444
    (HB1589)
Economic Development - Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthoritySenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1062 / CH0603
    (HB1533 / CH0604)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1066
    (HB1553)
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development DistrictSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB1086
    (HB0500)
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in MarylandSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1112 / CH0320Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit ProgramPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.