Commercial Rehabilitation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0282Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - ExpansionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0649 / CH0085
    (SB0569 / CH0084)
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding AreasCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0695 / CH0096
    (SB0930 / CH0095)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1052
    (SB0873 / CH0489)
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - AlterationDelegate WalkerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0569 / CH0084
    (HB0649 / CH0085)
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding AreasCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0796Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0873 / CH0489
    (HB1052)
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - AlterationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0930 / CH0095
    (HB0695 / CH0096)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsAnne Arundel County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:44 P.M.