Community Development

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0022 / CH0754
    (SB0809 / CH0755)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment AreaDelegate GibsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 754Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0108 / CH0766Department of Housing and Community Development - Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Application RequirementDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 766Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0109
    (SB0821)
Community Development Program Act of 2018Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0161
    (SB0187 / CH0010)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0239 / CH0778Prince George's County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Community Amenities - Advertising PG 412-18Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 778Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0303Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program Tax Credit - Maximum ContributionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0401
    (SB0347)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Brentwood Town CenterDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0468Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – Parks and PeopleDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0407 / CH0722)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentDelegate LiermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 721Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0659
    (SB0822)
Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of FundingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0788 / CH0227
    (SB0676 / CH0226)
Baltimore City - Community Benefits DistrictsDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0796
    (SB0841)
Pimlico Community Development Authority – MembershipDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0934
    (SB0557)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergyDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1140
    (SB0794)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Armory PlazaDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1178 / CH0313
    (SB0925 / CH0314)
Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased PropertyDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1231
    (SB0320)
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable DonationsDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1651Sustainable Communities – DesignationDelegate WilkinsIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0320
    (HB1231)
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable DonationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0347
    (HB0401)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Brentwood Town CenterSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0480 / CH0751Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact GrantsSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 751Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0557
    (HB0934)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergySenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0676 / CH0226
    (HB0788 / CH0227)
Baltimore City - Community Benefits DistrictsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0794
    (HB1140)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Armory PlazaSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0809 / CH0755
    (HB0022 / CH0754)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment AreaSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0821
    (HB0109)
Community Development Program Act of 2018Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0822
    (HB0659)
Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of FundingSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationSocial Services - Generally (O1)
SB0841
    (HB0796)
Pimlico Community Development Authority – MembershipSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0925 / CH0314
    (HB1178 / CH0313)
Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased PropertySenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0966RISE Zones - Expansion and Income Tax CreditSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1245Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Mount Rainier Civic CenterSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:41 A.M.