Congress, U.S.

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0233Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0001Reform of the Federal Toxic Substances Control Act of 1976Delegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HJ0003Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0002U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt IncreasesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0003Crisis in Waiting Periods for Veterans with Disabilities to Receive Services from the Federal Veterans Benefits AdministrationSenator PetersIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SJ0004Support of the Efforts of the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic to Develop as a Free and Independent NationSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.