Congress, U.S.

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0698Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0915
    (SB0740)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0970General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1176Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and BoundariesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1213Maryland Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1217Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1327
    (SB0582)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0001 / JR0003)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsRules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0004United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and ApportionmentDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HJ0007
    (SJ0006)
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0582
    (HB1327)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator FroshSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SJ0005Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of AllegianceSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0006
    (HJ0007)
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.