Constitutional Amendments

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0129Staggered Election Terms - Charter County CouncilsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0199Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate CourtDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0223Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0224Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0260 / CH0511
    (SB0554)
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a VacancyDelegate MoonAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 511Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0288
    (SB0555)
Attorney General and Comptroller - Special Elections to Fill a VacancyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0388Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0448
    (SB0179)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0467Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and ProcessesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0481
    (SB0502)
Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0663
    (SB0580)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0665Constitutional Amendment - Marijuana - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0753
    (SB0808)
State BudgetDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB1032Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1209General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1270House Legislative Districts - Single MemberDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1346
    (SB0045)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1388Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HJ0003
    (SJ0004)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0006
    (SJ0005)
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - RepealDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0008
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0045
    (HB1346)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0179
    (HB0448)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0502
    (HB0481)
Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeSenator MillerIn the House - Second Reading PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0554
    (HB0260 / CH0511)
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Appointments to Fill a VacancySenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0555
    (HB0288)
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Temporary Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a VacancySenator PinskyIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0580
    (HB0663)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0808
    (HB0753)
State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SJ0002
    (HJ0008)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0004
    (HJ0003)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0005
    (HJ0006)
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.