Consumer Price Index

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0308Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index AdjustmentsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0683
    (HB1204)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.