Consumer Price Index

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0062 / CH0279State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Reemployment Earnings LimitationDelegate McConkeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0580
    (SB0476)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActDelegate HayesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0688
    (SB0407)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0911Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1020Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index AdjustmentsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1329
    (SB0967)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1416
    (SB0962)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0273State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity ProgramSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledBudget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0407
    (HB0688)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0476
    (HB0580)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0962
    (HB1416)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0967
    (HB1329)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1005Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent IncreasesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:48 P.M.