Continuing Care

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0416
    (SB0873)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0588Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1090 / CH0130
    (SB0670)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1267Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016Delegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1296Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service RequirementDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1347Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - DisenrollmentDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1385 / CH0510Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0670
    (HB1090 / CH0130)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community LicenseSenator KasemeyerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0873
    (HB0416)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.