Continuing Care

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0189Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0411
    (SB0418)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0794
    (SB0419)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care CenterDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0953 / CH0213
    (SB0696 / CH0212)
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and PlanningDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1083 / CH0028
    (SB1081)
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of CareDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1613
    (SB0876)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsDisabled (O3)
SB0418
    (HB0411)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0419
    (HB0794)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care CenterSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0696 / CH0212
    (HB0953 / CH0213)
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and PlanningSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0876
    (HB1613)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceDisabled (O3)
SB0903Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding RequirementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation
Public Health (J1)
SB1081
    (HB1083 / CH0028)
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of CareSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:03 P.M.