Contractors

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0634 / CH0301
    (SB0285 / CH0302)
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0977State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1117 / CH0477
    (SB0927 / CH0478)
Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - PenaltiesDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1243Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesDelegate MoralesVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1281State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public AccessDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1365Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)Delegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1390Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1493
    (SB0526)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1539 / CH0846
    (SB0853 / CH0017)
Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid WagesDelegate LisantiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1552Procurement - Preferred Providers - Price Determinations, Work Opportunities, and SubcontractingDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1616
    (SB0948)
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – Subcontracting PG/MC 115-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing canceledHealth and Government OperationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1627Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention ProceedsDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1787State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide PreventionDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0111 / CH0663Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax InformationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0285 / CH0302
    (HB0634 / CH0301)
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - EstablishmentSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0526
    (HB1493)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0778Procurement - Payment Security - Construction ContractsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0853 / CH0017
    (HB1539 / CH0846)
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid WagesSenator KlausmeierEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0927 / CH0478
    (HB1117 / CH0477)
Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - PenaltiesSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0948
    (HB1616)
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Minority Business Enterprises – SubcontractingSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1155Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention ProceedsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB1160Procurement – Subcontractors – Bond AmountSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.