Conventions

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesElections (G1)
SJ0002
    (HJ0002)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.