Correctional Officers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0035Criminal Law - Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting a Handgun - Active Assignment ExceptionDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0183
    (SB0441 / CH0055)
Correctional Training Commission - MembersDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0254 / CH0092Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before ReleaseAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0494 / CH0480
    (SB0477 / CH0479)
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in ServiceDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0496 / CH0476
    (SB0474 / CH0475)
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or SurplusesDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 476Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0718
    (SB0813 / CH0556)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveDelegate SerafiniVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0852 / CH0551
    (SB0801 / CH0550)
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and ClarificationDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0873Workers' Compensation - Public Safety EmployeesDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1256Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress DisorderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1304
    (SB0661)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0441 / CH0055
    (HB0183)
Correctional Training Commission - MembersSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0474 / CH0475
    (HB0496 / CH0476)
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or SurplusesSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0477 / CH0479
    (HB0494 / CH0480)
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in ServiceSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0661
    (HB1304)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0801 / CH0550
    (HB0852 / CH0551)
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0813 / CH0556
    (HB0718)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB1070
    (HB1475)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.