Correctional Officers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and NegotiationDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0036 / CH0580Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0083
    (SB0073 / CH0647)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0089 / CH0654Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - AdministrationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0129Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional OfficersDelegate KnottsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0205 / CH0589Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Economic Matters
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0296 / CH0581Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional OfficersDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0354
    (SB0299 / CH0579)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0414Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0542Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting RightsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0543Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty FundDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1182
    (SB0988)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1255Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification CardDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1256Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1411
    (SB0346)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1479Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
SB0048 / CH0588Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0063Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0073 / CH0647
    (HB0083)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0104Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0299 / CH0579
    (HB0354)
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – MembershipPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0346
    (HB1411)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0510Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0620Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Former Baltimore City Jail EmployeesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0988
    (HB1182)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0996 / CH0573Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income (Hometown Heroes and Veterans Act of 2018)Senator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:02 P.M.