County Commissioners

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0173 / CH0303
    (SB0212 / CH0302)
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - MembershipDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0209 / CH0295
    (SB0124 / CH0294)
St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0446 / CH0178
    (SB0909 / CH0177)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0605 / CH0141
    (SB0204 / CH0142)
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort RitchieWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0758
    (SB0591 / CH0695)
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue SquadsDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0914
    (SB0735 / CH0426)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow MoneySt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0973
    (SB0787)
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - LocationDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1300 / CH0419Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider DisplacementCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1341Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1478Calvert County - Competitive Bidding ProcessCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0124 / CH0294
    (HB0209 / CH0295)
St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0204 / CH0142
    (HB0605 / CH0141)
PenMar Development Corporation - Dissolution - Authority of Washington County Over Fort RitchieWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0212 / CH0302
    (HB0173 / CH0303)
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - MembershipSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0352Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding ExtensionCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0497 / CH0446
    (HB0093)
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0532Temporary Family Health Care Structures - PermitsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0591 / CH0695
    (HB0758)
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue SquadsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 695Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0735 / CH0426
    (HB0914)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow MoneySenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0787
    (HB0973)
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - LocationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0909 / CH0177
    (HB0446 / CH0178)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:40 A.M.