County Councils

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0245
    (SB0064)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0102Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0129Staggered Election Terms - Charter County CouncilsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0243
    (SB0166)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0352 / CH0261Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System AuditsDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0360 / CH0719
    (SB0073)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0415
    (SB0419)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB0816 / CH0632Cecil County - Sheriff - SalaryCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1017 / CH0369
    (SB0256 / CH0368)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1024 / CH0731Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1025Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1032Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1124Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1135 / CH0299Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0064
    (HB0009 / CH0245)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0256 / CH0368
    (HB1017 / CH0369)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled HomeownersSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0419
    (HB0415)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0752State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along HighwaysSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.