County Executives

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0777Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0994Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1017 / CH0437Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1092Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14Howard County DelegationIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1205 / CH0645
    (SB0993)
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of MarylandFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1415 / CH0261
    (SB1017)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate KaiserAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
SB0993
    (HB1205 / CH0645)
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator BrinkleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1017
    (HB1415 / CH0261)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.