County Executives

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0245
    (SB0064)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0352 / CH0261Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System AuditsDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0415
    (SB0419)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB0816 / CH0632Cecil County - Sheriff - SalaryCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1065Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 2-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1124Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1135 / CH0299Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1521
    (SB1140 / CH0242)
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center LicenseDelegate AndertonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1556
    (SB1128 / CH0712)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
RulesCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0064
    (HB0009 / CH0245)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0419
    (HB0415)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park AmphitheaterSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1128 / CH0712
    (HB1556)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingSenator YoungEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB1140 / CH0242
    (HB1521)
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.