Court of Appeals

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0078
    (SB0160)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0618Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0790State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch EmployeesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1006Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19) Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1156
    (SB0819)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0160
    (HB0078)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionSenator FroshIn the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0268Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public InformationSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0701Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0819
    (HB1156)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.