Court of Appeals

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0046
    (SB0275)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0108
    (SB0032)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0239
    (SB0540)
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit CardDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0542
    (SB0017)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Family Law (D4)
HB0563Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0845Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono RequirementDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0915
    (SB0740)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0970General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1213Maryland Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1292
    (SB0824)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingDelegate JonesIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0017
    (HB0542)
Family Law - Performance of Marriage CeremoniesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0032
    (HB0108)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0275
    (HB0046)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0375Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0540
    (HB0239)
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit CardSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0824
    (HB1292)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1038Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All CountiesSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.