Crabs

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0029Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0524 / CH0054
    (SB0128 / CH0053)
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - RepealDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1314 / CH0400Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0059 / CH0401Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0128 / CH0053
    (HB0524 / CH0054)
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - RepealSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 10:58 A.M.