Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0186Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Fees for Traffic and Criminal Convictions - Law Enforcement Training and Technology FundDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0292 / CH0431Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of SunsetChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0535Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program FundDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0545Task Force to Study the Impact of Assault WeaponsDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0663Public Safety - Firearms - National Crime Information Center ParticipationDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0874Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms - ExtensionDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Safety (E4)
HB0876Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task ForceDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0966
    (SB0788)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1178
    (SB0590)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of SunsetDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1186Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate McComasIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0590
    (HB1178)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of SunsetSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0788
    (HB0966)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.