Criminal Background Investigations

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0028
    (SB0054 / CH0016)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsDelegate DavisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Economic Matters
1/21/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0119 / CH0094State Board of Physicians - Licensing Exemption - Physicians With Traveling Athletic and Sports TeamsDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Health and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0140 / CH0477
    (SB0206)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0164 / CH0098State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current EmployeesChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0265Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0279Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0358 / CH0077
    (SB0629 / CH0076)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0692Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - TransactionsDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1114
    (SB0482)
State Board of Physicians - License Renewal - Grace PeriodsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1420 / CH0739State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Licensure, Registration, and RegulationDelegate CullisonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1429Recovery Home Residential Rights Protection ActDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1480Background Check Accountability Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1489
    (SB0171)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0054 / CH0016
    (HB0003 / CH0028)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0087 / CH0340Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0171
    (HB1489)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0206
    (HB0140 / CH0477)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program EvaluationPresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0282 / CH0185Early Childhood Development - Transfer of ProvisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0446Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0482
    (HB1114)
State Board of Physicians - License Renewal - Grace PeriodsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0629 / CH0076
    (HB0358 / CH0077)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0947Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary TransactionsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0976Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and RegulationSenator PetersIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1142State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.