Criminal Background Investigations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0247Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0581
    (SB0633)
Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check RequirementDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0694
    (SB0543)
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)Delegate McIntoshIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0897
    (SB0684)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0912State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Criminal History Records Checks - Renewals and ReinstatementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1113
    (SB0988)
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker ActDelegate LamIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1183
    (SB0986)
State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate WestIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1265 / CH0218
    (SB0549 / CH0217)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1448Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - TransactionsDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1552
    (SB0766)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle PermitsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0045 / CH0195Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records ChecksChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0240Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0543
    (HB0694)
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0549 / CH0217
    (HB1265 / CH0218)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0633
    (HB0581)
Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check RequirementSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0684
    (HB0897)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0766
    (HB1552)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle PermitsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0948Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary TransactionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0986
    (HB1183)
State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0988
    (HB1113)
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker ActSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:04 P.M.