Deaf Persons

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0519
    (SB0528)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp MerrickCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0630
    (SB0576 / CH0180)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit CertificationDelegate GriffithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0653 / CH0606Education - Deaf Culture Digital LibraryDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1536Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Deafnet Parking Lot ExpansionDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0020Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name ChangeSenator ForehandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0103 / CH0030Public Health Programs for Children - Renaming and ModernizationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0528
    (HB0519)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp MerrickSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0576 / CH0180
    (HB0630)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit CertificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.