Deaf Persons

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0639 / CH0189Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 189Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.