Dealers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0047 / CH0199
    (SB0090 / CH0200)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – ModificationsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0148 / CH0120Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0213
    (SB0253 / CH0224)
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0358
    (SB0313)
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume DealersSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0434
    (SB0529)
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty RequirementsDelegate DavisIn the Senate - Favorable with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0466Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record KeepingDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0649Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of MinorDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0724
    (SB0604)
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to DealerWestern Maryland DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1418Criminal Law - Distribution of Fentanyl - PenaltiesDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1480
    (SB0982)
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious OrdersSpeakerIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1730Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0253 / CH0224
    (HB0213)
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - ProhibitionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0313
    (HB0358)
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume DealersPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0529
    (HB0434)
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty RequirementsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceFinance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0604
    (HB0724)
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to DealerSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0908Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0982
    (HB1480)
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious OrdersPresidentIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.