Debt Collection

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0309Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money JudgmentDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0600
    (SB0502)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and FinanceHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0814Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1018
    (SB0793)
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion ProgramsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1157
    (SB0432)
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure RequirementsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0067 / CH0017Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control PurposesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0432
    (HB1157)
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure RequirementsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0502
    (HB0600)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0793
    (HB1018)
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion ProgramsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.