Debt Collection

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187 / CH0479
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0254Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful CollectionsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0275 / CH0108St. Mary's County - Metropolitan CommissionSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0673
    (SB0022)
Debt Collection - Exemptions From AttachmentDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1161 / CH0195
    (SB0856 / CH0196)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsDelegate BrooksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1253
    (SB0068)
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From LicensureDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1465 / CH0058Tax Sales - Homeowner ProtectionsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1539 / CH0846
    (SB0853 / CH0017)
Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid WagesDelegate LisantiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1642
    (SB1012)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – OmbudsmanDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0006
    (HB0187 / CH0479)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0022
    (HB0673)
Debt Collection - Exemptions From AttachmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0042 / CH0549Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of LimitationsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0068
    (HB1253)
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From LicensureSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0853 / CH0017
    (HB1539 / CH0846)
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid WagesSenator KlausmeierEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0856 / CH0196
    (HB1161 / CH0195)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1012
    (HB1642)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of ServicersSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.