Deeds

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0186
    (SB0101)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0840Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency JudgmentDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0929
    (SB0756)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB1168Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile MediationDelegate McConkeyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
HB1178 / CH0301Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of TrustDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1184
    (SB0835)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Delegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Delegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1197
    (SB0875)
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of DeficiencyDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
HB1215
    (SB0876)
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False StatementsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0101
    (HB0186)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0292Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent RecordingsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0756
    (HB0929)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015Senator MuseIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0783Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency JudgmentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0835
    (HB1184)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceReal Property (N1)
SB0875
    (HB1197)
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of DeficiencySenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Real Property (N1)
SB0876
    (HB1215)
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False StatementsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0877
    (HB1195)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Senator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.