District Courts

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0048Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Nolle ProsequiDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0185 / CH0773Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and EnforcementDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 773Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0325Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - PresentmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0371
    (SB0312)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)SpeakerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
HB0471
    (SB0215)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0476
    (SB0746 / CH0834)
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous CountyChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0495
    (SB0154 / CH0744)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0563Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - IssuanceDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0941 / CH0410
    (SB0631)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1215
    (SB0983)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1218Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial ConditionsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1390
    (SB0880)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0154 / CH0744
    (HB0495)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltySenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0215
    (HB0471)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0312
    (HB0371)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)PresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0500 / CH0544Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney RepresentationSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0501Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by JurySenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0631
    (HB0941 / CH0410)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0714 / CH0606Criminal Procedure - Indigent Individual - Indigency DeterminationSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0746 / CH0834
    (HB0476)
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous CountyChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0880
    (HB1390)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - ReformSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0933Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - PresentmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Gaming (C7)
SB0946Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0983
    (HB1215)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1014Real Property - Expedited Wrongful Detainer Proceedings - Property for Sale or LeaseSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.