Dogs

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108 / CH0293
    (SB0104 / CH0292)
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - DogsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0187 / CH0290
    (SB0103 / CH0291)
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of ProvisionsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0432
    (SB0366)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0528
    (SB0420)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0626 / CH0409Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and EnforcementDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0781 / CH0343Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement RevisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1243Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service DogsDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0077 / CH0196Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0103 / CH0291
    (HB0187 / CH0290)
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of ProvisionsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0104 / CH0292
    (HB0108 / CH0293)
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - DogsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0366
    (HB0432)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0420
    (HB0528)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Senator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0441 / CH0416Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - EstablishmentSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 11:00 A.M.