Domestic Violence

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0224
    (SB0315 / CH0338)
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective OrderDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0225
    (SB0269 / CH0335)
Domestic Violence - Additional ReliefDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0263 / CH0233Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit MurderDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0552 / CH0494
    (SB0703)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0606
    (SB0477 / CH0354)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefDelegate DumaisIn the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0667Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0807
    (SB0277)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0857
    (SB0530)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1083
    (SB0550)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1186Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of VictimDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0269 / CH0335
    (HB0225)
Domestic Violence - Additional ReliefSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0277
    (HB0807)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0315 / CH0338
    (HB0224)
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective OrderSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0477 / CH0354
    (HB0606)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0530
    (HB0857)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0550
    (HB1083)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0703
    (HB0552 / CH0494)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.