Elder Abuse and Neglect

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0047 / CH0207Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care QualityChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0680 / CH0605Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion TimeSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.